GK Question: List of Lok Sabha Speaker in India
Ganesh Vasudev Mavalankar:
Period: 15 May 1952 to27 February 1956
M. A. Ayyangar:
Period: 8 March 1956 to 10 May 1957 & 11
May 1957 to16 April 1962
Sardar Hukam Singh:
Period: 17 April 1962 to 16 March 1967
Neelam Sanjiva Reddy:
Period: 17 March 1967 to 19 July 1969
Gurdial Singh Dhillon:
Period: 8 August 1969 to 19 March 1971 & 22
March 1971 to 1 December 1975
Bali Ram Bhagat:
Period: 15 January 1976 to 25 March 1977
Neelam Sanjiva Reddy:
Period: 26 March 1977 to 13 July 1977
K. S. Hegde:
Period: 21 July 1977 to 21 January 1980
Balram Jakhar:
Period: 22 January 1980 to15 January 1985 &
16 January 1985 to 18 December 1989
Rabi Ray:
Period: 19 December 1989 to 9 July 1991
Shivraj Patil:
Period: 10 July 1991 to 22 May 1996
P. A. Sangma:
Period: 23 May 1996 to 23 March 1998
G. M. C. Balayogi:
Period: 24 March 1998 to 19 October 1999 &
22 October 1999 to 3 March 2002
Manohar Joshi:
Period: 10 May 2002 to 2 June 2004
Somnath Chatterjee:
Period: 4 June 2004 to 30 May 2009
Meira Kumar:
Period: 30 May 2009 to 4 June 2014
Sumitra Mahajan:
Period: 6 June 2014 to 16 June 2019
Om Birla:
Period: 18 June, 2019: incumbent