GK Question: Chief Election Commissions in India
1.
Sukumar Sen: 21 March 1950 – 19 December 1958
2.
Kalyan Sundaram: 20 December 1958 – 30 September 1967
3.
S. P. Sen Verma: 1 October 1967 – 30 September 1972
4.
Nagendra Singh: 1 October 1972 – 6 February 1973
5.
T. Swaminathan: 7 February 1973 – 17 June 1977
6.
S.L. Shakdher: 18 June 1977 – 17 June 1982
7.
R.K Trivedi: 18 June 1982 – 31 December 1985
8.
R.V.S Peri Sastri: 1 January 1986 – 25 November 1990
9.
V.S. Ramadevi: 26 November 1990 – 11 December 1990
10.
T.N Seshan: 12 December 1990 – 11 December 1996
11.
M.S Gill: 12 December 1996 – 13 June 2001
12.
James Michael Lyngdoh: 14 June 2001 – 7 February 2004
13.
T. S. Krishnamurthy: 8 February 2004 – 15 May 2005
14.
B. B. Tandon: 16 May 2005 – 29 June 2006
15.
N. Gopalaswami: 30 June 2006 – 20 April 2009
16.
Navin Chawla: 21 April 2009 – 29 July 2010
17.
S. Y. Quraishi: 30 July 2010 – 10 June 2012
18.
V. S. Sampath: 11 June 2012 – 15 January 2015
19.
Harishankar Brahma: 16 January 2015 – 18 April 2015
20.
Nasim Zaidi: 19 April 2015 – 5 July 2017
21.
Achal Kumar Jyoti: 6 July 2017 – 22 January 2018
22.
Om Prakash Rawat: 23 January 2018 – 1 December 2018
23.
Sunil Arora: 2 December 2018 – 12 April 2021
24.
Sushil Chandra: 13 April 2021 – Present